This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 09:33:19 (UTC).

FANNY RODRIGUEZ VS VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC ET

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 FANNY RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY A. GREEN and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0051

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY A. GREEN

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ FANNY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

VILLA ELENA HEALTHCARE CENTER

PROGRESSIVE HEALTH CARE

GOINGS & GOINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK ESQ.

WEBSTER JOSHUA M

EBRAHIMIAN NASSIR NICK ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARBER JOHN L. ESQ.

ANSON LAURA JEAN

BARBER JOHN LONGYEAR ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/14/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/24/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

1/16/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/30/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/30/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Judicial Notice

2/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

2/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

2/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Quash

2/22/2019: Motion to Quash

Motion to Quash

2/22/2019: Motion to Quash

Motion to Quash

2/22/2019: Motion to Quash

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Request for Judicial Notice

3/15/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

3/15/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/19/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Motion for Leave

3/20/2019: Motion for Leave

Answer

3/25/2019: Answer

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Opposition (to Motion to Compel); Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Opposition (to Motion to Quash); Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Opposition (to Motion to Quash); Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Opposition (to Motion to Quash); Filed by Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Villa Elena Healthcare Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA OF OXFORD SERVICES HEALTHCARE) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Fanny Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Fanny Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • PLAINTIFF FANNY RODRIGUEZ' NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Fanny Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Fanny Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RELIEF FOR: 1.DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN V1()LATJOS OF GOVERNMENT CODE 12940(A): DISPARATE TREATMENT BASED ON DISABILITY AND/OR PERCEIVED DISABILITY ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less