This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 01:39:45 (UTC).

FANG, CHARLOTTE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 FANG, CHARLOTTE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MATCHAM, SUSAN J., SIMPSON, C. EDWARD and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4300

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MATCHAM, SUSAN J.

SIMPSON, C. EDWARD

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELL LILI

Decedent

FANG CHARLOTTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BELL JEFFREY THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

5/3/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Minute Order

5/28/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/3/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/5/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/8/2021: Minute Order

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

2/8/2022: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

2/8/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

2/8/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Matcham, Susan J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Matcham, Susan J., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Advanced - Previous Date & Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Simpson, C. Edward, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL JEFFREY THOMAS ESQ.