This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 04:59:26 (UTC).

FAMILY URGENT CARE MEDICAL CENTER INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SUNBELT RENTALS, INC., A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 FAMILY URGENT CARE MEDICAL CENTER INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUNBELT RENTALS, INC , A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0040

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAMILY URGENT CARE MEDICAL CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

SUNBELT RENTALS INC. A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MEISLIN JONATHAN E.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

5/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice of Related Case

5/6/2021: Notice of Related Case

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/12/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

3/12/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/8/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/4/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Hearing06/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by Family Urgent Care Medical Center Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Family Urgent Care Medical Center Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Family Urgent Care Medical Center Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Family Urgent Care Medical Center Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Family Urgent Care Medical Center Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNBELT RENTALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH