This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 12:47:13 (UTC).

FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS BOGOTA INVESTMENT ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOGOTA INVESTMENT ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0557

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FALLS LAKE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BOGOTA INVESTMENT ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CU JOHN T.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/31/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/31/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/31/2019: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTE...)

10/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTE...)

Notice of Settlement

11/18/2019: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • Hearing12/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Hearing12/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Service on All Unserved Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Falls Lake National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY SPECIALTY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CU JOHN T.