This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 03:16:59 (UTC).

FAIRCHILD PLUMBING & MECHANICAL INC VS TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2018 FAIRCHILD PLUMBING MECHANICAL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5435

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRCHILD PLUMBING & MECHANICAL INC.

Defendants

SUNWEST BANK

TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC.

OAK PARK MANOR LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDMAN BRUCE DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

PITRE RANDALL JOHN

KREIS JOHN P.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

5/11/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

SUMMONS

5/11/2018: SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF MAILING

5/23/2018: DECLARATION OF MAILING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

GENERAL DENIAL

6/28/2018: GENERAL DENIAL

ANSWER BY DEFENDANT TOVEY/ SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

6/28/2018: ANSWER BY DEFENDANT TOVEY/ SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/9/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

12/14/2018: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Fairchild Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Fairchild Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFENDANT TOVEY/ SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC., TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fairchild Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fairchild Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fairchild Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Fairchild Plumbing & Mechanical, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less