This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 22:18:05 (UTC).

FACTORY DECASA, INC. VS HIDALGO EQUIPMENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 FACTORY DECASA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HIDALGO EQUIPMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0311

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FACTORY DECASA INC.

ESPINOZA MARIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HIDALGO OSWALDO

HIDALGO EQUIPMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

TKACH JOHN ANTHONY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LESPIER MANFREDO E

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: TRIAL READINESS/MSC)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: TRIAL READINESS/MSC)

Notice of Status Conference and Order

4/19/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/5/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/8/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Mail

11/23/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/16/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

10/16/2020: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/16/2020: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/16/2020: Separate Statement

Case Management Statement

9/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/30/2020: Answer

Answer

6/2/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • Hearing10/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department STL-C at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; MSC Timeslot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Status Conference (ReTrial Readiness/MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Trial Readiness/MSC)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Factory Decasa, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Factory Decasa, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hidalgo Equipment, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hidalgo Equipment, Inc. (Defendant); Oswaldo Hidalgo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Factory Decasa, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Factory Decasa, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Factory Decasa, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Factory Decasa, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Factory Decasa, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESPIER MANFREDO E