This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 22:18:46 (UTC).

FACCHETTI, EUNICE - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 FACCHETTI, EUNICE - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9308

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FACCHETTI NOLBERTO

Not Classified By Court

FACCHETTI EUNICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KATZEN SUSAN A.

 

Court Documents

Petition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial)

9/23/2021: Petition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial)

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

1/14/2022: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Spousal Property Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketPetition - Spousal/Domestic Partner Property (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZEN, SUSAN A