This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 04:25:48 (UTC).

FACCHETTI, EUNICE - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 FACCHETTI, EUNICE - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3802

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Conservators and Petitioners

FACCHETTI NOLBERTO

FACCHETTI ADRIANOS

Not Classified By Court

FACCHETTI EUNICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

TABU NENAVER BAUTISTA

SHELDON NENAVER TABU

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SCHWARTZ RICHARD OWEN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Death - Notice of Death

5/28/2021: Notice - Death - Notice of Death

Notice - Notice

1/22/2021: Notice - Notice

Order - Appointing Conservator

11/19/2020: Order - Appointing Conservator

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Final

12/9/2020: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal - Final

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

12/14/2020: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

12/18/2020: Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

Proposed Order - Appointment of Conservator - Order - Appointing Conservator

10/29/2020: Proposed Order - Appointment of Conservator - Order - Appointing Conservator

Report - Court Appointed Counsel

9/29/2020: Report - Court Appointed Counsel

Minute Order

10/2/2020: Minute Order

Proof - Mailing

8/6/2020: Proof - Mailing

Citation - Citation w/pos

7/31/2020: Citation - Citation w/pos

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

7/31/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Letters - Temporary

5/29/2020: Letters - Temporary

Bond

5/29/2020: Bond

Report - Court Appointed Counsel

5/18/2020: Report - Court Appointed Counsel

Ex Parte - Order

5/20/2020: Ex Parte - Order

Ex Parte - Order

5/20/2020: Ex Parte - Order

Ex Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

5/14/2020: Ex Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice - Death (Notice of Death )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketLetters (Initial) - Conservatorship; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal - Final ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Application; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (RE Ex Parte Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHELDON NENAVER TABU