This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:49:29 (UTC).

FABRIC SELECTION INC VS MOON UP IN THE SKY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 FABRIC SELECTION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MOON UP IN THE SKY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9099

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FABRIC SELECTION INC

Defendants and Respondents

MOON UP IN THE SKY INC

BERRY MIRACLE

DOES 1 TO 50

MOON BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

2/9/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/22/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

STATEMENT OF CASE

4/30/2018: STATEMENT OF CASE

DECLARATION OF ROSITA NEMAN IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

4/30/2018: DECLARATION OF ROSITA NEMAN IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST; AUTHORITY TO RECOVER INTEREST AND COSTS PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES CONTRACT

4/30/2018: COMPUTATION OF INTEREST; AUTHORITY TO RECOVER INTEREST AND COSTS PURSUANT TO THE PARTIES CONTRACT

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/14/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution

1/17/2019: Writ of Execution

Minute Order

11/17/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/11/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/9/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

8/14/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/14/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

7/27/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Fabric Selection Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Fabric Selection Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Fabric Selection Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • STATEMENT OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Statement of the Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Fabric Selection Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACTS; 2. OPEN ACCOUNT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Fabric Selection Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOON UP IN THE SKY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FABRIC SELECTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POURSALIMI PAYAM Y