Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 00:48:51 (UTC).

EZRIE MYERS VS UTILITY TREE SERVICE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 EZRIE MYERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UTILITY TREE SERVICE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2402

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYERS EZRIE

Defendants

UTILITY TREE SERVICE LLC

CHAIDEZ JOSE CAMPOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDVER ALINA

Defendant Attorney

MENDOZA ANDY

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

4/14/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/29/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

5/13/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/13/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 3:30 PM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Ezrie Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;); Filed by Utility Tree Service LLC (Defendant); Jose Campos Chaidez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ezrie Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ezrie Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ezrie Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ezrie Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ezrie Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UTILITY TREE SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDVER ALINA