This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 17:38:09 (UTC).

EZRA ANTOINE TURNER, VS BUENA VISTA FOODS(BVF), LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 EZRA ANTOINE TURNER, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BUENA VISTA FOODS BVF , LLC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9504

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TURNER EZRA ANTOINE

Defendants

PEOPLE FIRST EMPLOYMENT INC.

VENSURE HR INC.

BUENA VISTA FOOD PRODUCTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL JESSICA L.

Defendant Attorneys

ERNSTER ELIZABETH A.

MASON BENJAMIN KENDALL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

3/14/2023: Case Management Order

Notice of Ruling

3/14/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

3/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING CASE ANYWHERE AS ELECTRONIC SERVICE PROVIDER

3/14/2023: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING CASE ANYWHERE AS ELECTRONIC SERVICE PROVIDER

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/13/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Order - COURT'S RULING AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANT PEOPLE FIRST EMPLOYMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

3/13/2023: Order - COURT'S RULING AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANT PEOPLE FIRST EMPLOYMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER HEARD ON MARCH 1, 2023;)

3/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER HEARD ON MARCH 1, 2023;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION;)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION;)

Answer - DEFENDANT VENSURE HR, INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/23/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT VENSURE HR, INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Reply - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT PEOPLE FIRST EMPLOYMENT INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

2/22/2023: Reply - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT PEOPLE FIRST EMPLOYMENT INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE

2/16/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EZRA ANTOINE TURNER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

2/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EZRA ANTOINE TURNER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

2/15/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

2/15/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT JOINT

2/10/2023: Initial Status Conference Report - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT JOINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/19/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

1/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/17/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2024
  • Hearing04/19/2024 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: For Defendants, Buena Vista Food and Vensure HR's, Failure to Appear at 3/14/2023 Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Ezra Antoine Turner, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 04/19/2024 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: For Defendants, Buena Vista Food and Vensure HR's, Failure to Appear at 3/14/2023 Initial Status Conference scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Case Anywhere as Electronic Service Provider; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 03/14/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Judicial Bulletin Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ezra Antoine Turner, (Plaintiff); As to: Buena Vista Foods(BVF), LLC. (Defendant); People First Employment Inc. (Defendant); Vensure HR, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ezra Antoine Turner, (Plaintiff); As to: Buena Vista Foods(BVF), LLC. (Defendant); People First Employment Inc. (Defendant); Vensure HR, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ezra Antoine Turner, (Plaintiff); As to: Buena Vista Foods(BVF), LLC. (Defendant); People First Employment Inc. (Defendant); Vensure HR, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less