This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 08:18:50 (UTC).

EZEQUIEL QUINONEZ VS SURGE GLOBAL BAKERIES HOLDINGS LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 EZEQUIEL QUINONEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SURGE GLOBAL BAKERIES HOLDINGS LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2603

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINONEZ EZEQUIEL

Defendants

AGHASI ASHUR

SURGE GLOBAL BAKERIES HOLDINGS LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BUBBLES DEVINE BAKERIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VOTRA ELIZABETH

RYU YOUNG W

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ezequiel Quinonez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUBBLES DIVINE BAKERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BUBBLES BAKING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOTRA ELIZABETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYU YOUNG W