This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 06:00:48 (UTC).

EZEQUIEL MARTINEZ VS NICOLAS ZEV SNEIDER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 EZEQUIEL MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICOLAS ZEV SNEIDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3437

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINEZ EZEQUIEL

Defendants and Respondents

SNEIDER NICOLAS ZEV

SNEIDER ARTURO

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY

GEOULLA DANIEL D.

Defendant Attorney

HUMPHREY CRAIG ALAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/07/2020

8/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/07/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/9/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DISCOVERY CUTOFFS;AND DECLARATION OF WILLIAM

12/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DISCOVERY CUTOFFS;AND DECLARATION OF WILLIAM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; INFORMAL D...)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; INFORMAL D...)

Notice of Ruling

10/25/2019: Notice of Ruling

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF EZEQUIEL MARTINEZ OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

10/16/2019: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF EZEQUIEL MARTINEZ OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

9/19/2019: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

9/19/2019: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

9/27/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF

8/5/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/23/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/30/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/8/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

2/8/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • Hearing05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketat 2:16 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 08/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 08/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nicolas Zev Sneider (Defendant); Arturo Sneider (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Ezequiel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Ezequiel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Ezequiel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ezequiel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693437    Hearing Date: January 23, 2020    Dept: 28

The court is unclear as to whether any motions remain on calendar.  The parties are requested to call Department 28 to inform it was to whether any motions do remain to be decided.