This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2019 at 02:51:23 (UTC).

EYEFIVE, INC. DBA SHIPOFFERS VS. PRVT HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 EYEFIVE, INC DBA SHIPOFFERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRVT HOLDINGS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6691

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHIPOFFERS

EYEFIVE INC.

Defendant

PRVT HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RUDY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/27/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Judgment-Entered) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketRequest-Enter Judgment; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff); SHIPOFFERS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EYEFIVE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRVT HOLDINGS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where EyeFive, Inc. doing business as ShipOffers is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA JR. RUDY