This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 20:30:40 (UTC).

EYDIE CHAVARRIA VS ECONOMY INN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 EYDIE CHAVARRIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ECONOMY INN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2003

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVARRIA EYDIE

Defendants

ECONOMY INN

PATEL BOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N.

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/16/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eydie Chavarria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eydie Chavarria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eydie Chavarria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N