Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 05:40:32 (UTC).

EYAL PINCHASSI VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 EYAL PINCHASSI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9109

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINCHASSI EYAL

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARR ROBERT L.

Defendant Attorneys

CONBOY SEAN P

CONBOY SEAN P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

10/15/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

6/22/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/20/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EYAL PINCHASSI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less