This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 04:08:54 (UTC).

EXUM, NORMA RUTH VS SALYERS, VICTORIA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 EXUM, NORMA RUTH filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against SALYERS, VICTORIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0246

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EXUM NORMA RUTH

Respondent

SALYERS VICTORIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.