Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 12:29:19 (UTC).

EXPERT REALTY GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION VS LAUREN LEE

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 EXPERT REALTY GROUP, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAUREN LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1526

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

EXPERT REALTY GROUP INC. A CORPORATION

HAN PETER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LEE LAUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KENNEDY J. STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

MANN JEFF A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/20/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/21/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/24/2021: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/8/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • Hearing09/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Expert Realty Group, Inc., a corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Lauren Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lauren Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Expert Realty Group, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Expert Realty Group, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Expert Realty Group, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less