This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2020 at 00:31:06 (UTC).

EXCELSIOR AT THE AMERICANA AT BRAND HOMOWNERS' ASSOCIATION VS AMERICANA HOUSING, L.P., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 EXCELSIOR AT THE AMERICANA AT BRAND HOMOWNERS' ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against AMERICANA HOUSING, L P . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2432

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EXCELSIOR AT THE AMERICANA AT BRAND HOMOWNERS' ASSOCIATION

THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA

Defendants

THE AMERICANA AT BRAND LLC

CARUSO MANAGEMENT COMPANY LTD.

AMERICANA HOUSING L.P.

AMERICANA HOMES LLC

AMERICANA HOMES II LLC

FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION

CARUSO AFFILIATED HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVINE SCOTT DAVID

YOUNG TYSON A.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT) OF 01/27/2020

1/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT) OF 01/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT)

1/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT) OF 07/25/2019

7/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF A JOINT STATUS REPORT) OF 07/25/2019

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PERMIT THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA TO FILE A COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF ITS INSURED, FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION,

5/31/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PERMIT THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA TO FILE A COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF ITS INSURED, FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION,

Order - ORDER PERMITTING THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA TO FILE A COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF ITS INSURED, FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORA

6/18/2019: Order - ORDER PERMITTING THE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA TO FILE A COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF ITS INSURED, FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION, A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORA

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

6/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION)

6/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION)

Motion for Leave to Intervene - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

4/5/2019: Motion for Leave to Intervene - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

3/11/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPOINTING JUDICIAL REFEREE

3/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER APPOINTING JUDICIAL REFEREE

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER COORDINATING ACTIONS UNDER JUDICIAL REFERENCE

3/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER COORDINATING ACTIONS UNDER JUDICIAL REFERENCE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/22/2019

2/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/22/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)

2/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 02/22/2019

2/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 02/22/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/22/2019

2/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/22/2019

Notice of Related Case

2/11/2019: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

1/29/2019: Stipulation - No Order - Stipulation - No Order FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • Hearing10/07/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Filing of a Joint Status Report) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing of a Joint Status Report) of 01/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing of a Joint Status Report)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Filing of a Joint Status Report) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing of a Joint Status Report) of 07/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing of a Joint Status Report)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketOrder (Permitting the Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania to File a Complaint-in-Intervention on Behalf of its Insured, Forefront Builders Corporation, a Suspended California Corporation); Filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Motion off Calendar); Filed by The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File Complaint in Intervention) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF SERVICE); Filed by Americana Housing, L.P. (Defendant); Americana Homes, LLC (Defendant); Americana Homes II, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF); Filed by Americana Housing, L.P. (Defendant); Americana Homes, LLC (Defendant); Americana Homes II, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Excelsior at the Americana at Brand Homowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Excelsior at the Americana at Brand Homowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Excelsior at the Americana at Brand Homowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Excelsior at the Americana at Brand Homowners' Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICANA HOMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICANA HOUSING L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION is a litigant