This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 19:30:45 (UTC).

EXCEL ADJUSTERS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TIGRAN PETROSYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 EXCEL ADJUSTERS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TIGRAN PETROSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7703

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXCEL ADJUSTERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

Y. TONY

PETROSYAN TIGRAN

PETROSYAN HRIPSIME

PETROSYAN ANGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITE STEPHEN STEVE EDWARD

WHITE STEPHEN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

KAZARYAN MARGARIT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (TIGRAN PETROSYAN); Filed by TIGRAN PETROSYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Defendant Tigran Petrosyan); Filed by TIGRAN PETROSYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer (of Tigran Petrosyan to Complaint); Filed by TIGRAN PETROSYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (at CMC held September 9, 2021; Notice of October 28, 2021 Case Management Conference); Filed by Excel Adjusters Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement (by Plaintiff); Filed by Excel Adjusters Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (by substituted service); Filed by Excel Adjusters Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Excel Adjusters Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Excel Adjusters Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Excel Adjusters Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXCEL ADJUSTERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE STEPHEN EDWARD