Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2021 at 02:13:58 (UTC).

EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SKANSKA-TRAYLOR-SHEA, A JOINT VENTURE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SKANSKA-TRAYLOR-SHEA, A JOINT VENTURE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7434

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA ESPARZA'S WELDING & MACHINE SHOP INC.

Defendants

FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC A CORPORATION

PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CORPORATION

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA A CORPORATION

FARMINGTON CASUALTY COMPANY A CORPORATION

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION

VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMP ANY A CORPORATION

ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARJNE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND A CORPORATION

AMERICAN FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY A CORPORATION

FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

ST. PAUL MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

SKANSKA-TRAYLOR-SHEA A JOINT VENTURE

TRAYLOR BROS. INC. A CORPORATION

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC AGENCY

UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMP ANY A CORPORATION

COLONIAL AMERICAN CASUALTY AND SURETY COMP ANY A CORPORATION

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARNO ANNA M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/25/2021: Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EW CORPORATION INDUSTRIAL FABRICATORS, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EW is a litigant

Latest cases where SKANSKA-TRAYLOR-SHEA A JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAYLOR BROS. INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Farmington Casualty Company is a litigant