Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 08:13:02 (UTC).

EVOLV AGENCY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS YOUNGBLOOD SKIN CARE PRODUCTS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 EVOLV AGENCY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YOUNGBLOOD SKIN CARE PRODUCTS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9461

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EVOLV AGENCY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EVOLV AGENCY LLC

Defendant

YOUNGBLOOD SKIN CARE PRODUCTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPENCER KENNETH F

WEISS MICHAEL J

WEISS MICHAEL J.

SPENCER KENNETH F.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020, MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020]

9/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020, MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/21/2020

9/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/21/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

8/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

7/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/4/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/27/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/27/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:54 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/31/2020, Minute Order (Court Order) of 07/31/2020]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Evolv Agency, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 07/31/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/31/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Evolv Agency, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evolv Agency, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evolv Agency, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evolv Agency, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUNDBLOOD SKIN CARE PRODUCTS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS MICHAEL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPENCER KENNETH F