This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2020 at 18:04:21 (UTC).

EVIGENIYA AELENKOVA VS DANIEL ROSE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 EVIGENIYA AELENKOVA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANIEL ROSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7370

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AELENKOVA EVIGENIYA

ZELENKOVA EVIGENIY A

Defendants

ROSE DANIEL

CLOVER SURGICAL CENTER INC

ISLA SURGERY CENTER INC.

CLOVER MEDICAL CORPORATION INC.

SUPERCLINIC PROFESSIONALS MEDICAL CORPORATION

SIERRA MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CORPORATION

MAYS ARCHIE

RUBIN MITCHELL

Not Classified By Court

JOHN HATHERLEY RECEIVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEISS MICHAEL H.

SEMENZA LAWRENCE JOHN

SEMEAZA LAWRENCE J.

REZNICK MICHAEL EUGENE

Defendant Attorney

GREENBLATT FREDRIC JAY

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS

3/2/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDERS

Proof of Service by Mail

1/15/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Affidavit of Identity and Order

11/22/2019: Affidavit of Identity and Order

Case Management Statement

9/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

9/30/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/15/2019

10/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/15/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

7/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/21/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

5/28/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

1/9/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Order - Agreed Order for appointment of John Hatherly as Receiver pursuant and for a temporary protective order

1/14/2019: Order - Agreed Order for appointment of John Hatherly as Receiver pursuant and for a temporary protective order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings of Defendants to set aside judgment orde...)

1/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings of Defendants to set aside judgment orde...)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/15/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings; Ex-Parte Proceedings Ex parte applicati...)

1/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings; Ex-Parte Proceedings Ex parte applicati...)

Order - Order approving motion to approve stipulation to amend order appointing receiver

12/18/2018: Order - Order approving motion to approve stipulation to amend order appointing receiver

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Orders) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Orders)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder (Turnover Order In Aid Of Execution [And Proposed Temporary Restraining Order In Aid Of Turnover Order]); Filed by Evigeniy A Zelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Orders); Filed by Evigeniy A Zelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Evigeniy A Zelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by John Hatherley, Receiver (Non-Party); Evigeniy A Zelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to prosecute)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by John Hatherley, Receiver (Non-Party); Evigeniy A Zelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (As to 1st Amended Complaint Only); Filed by John Hatherley, Receiver (Non-Party); Evigeniy A Zelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Entering Judgment...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evigeniya Aelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evigeniya Aelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketOrder (For appointment of Select Fiduciary Group, LLC as receiver pursuant to C.C.P. section 564(b)(3);); Filed by Evigeniya Aelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Evigeniy A Zelenkova (Plaintiff); John Hatherly (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to amend order appointing receiver); Filed by Evigeniya Aelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Order); Filed by Evigeniya Aelenkova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIERRA MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISS MICHAEL H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEMENZA III LAWRENCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REZNICK MICHAEL E.