This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 17:04:27 (UTC).

EVERLOVING HOME HEALTH INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MARYAM KHEIRANY

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 EVERLOVING HOME HEALTH INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MARYAM KHEIRANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8108

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVERLOVING HOME HEALTH INC.

Defendants

KHEIRANY MARYAM

LIVLIFE HOME HEALTH INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANIAGUA DUBLAS O. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

JAVAHERIZADEH PARHAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

4/26/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Motion

4/26/2021: Notice of Motion

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

6/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

7/7/2021: Notice of Ruling

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/7/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

8/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MTS

8/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MTS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to MTS); Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer); Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Maryam Kheirany (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Maryam Kheirany (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Maryam Kheirany (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Everloving Home Health Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERLOVING HOME HEALTH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANIAGUA DUBLAS O. ESQ.