Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 03:49:17 (UTC).

EVERLENE MCCARY VS LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 EVERLENE MCCARY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6747

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCCARY EVERLENE

Defendants and Respondents

MEMORIAL HEALTHTECH LABORATORIES

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC

DOES 1 TO 100

HHS COMMUNICATIONS INC

HHS CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOTTLER DOUGLAS E. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROSS JONATHAN A. ESQ.

HASKINS ANGELA S.

CONNELY MARK B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/8/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

10/23/2017: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Unknown

10/23/2017: Unknown

PROOF OP SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/16/2017: PROOF OP SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

6/28/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/28/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/28/2017: DEFENDANT LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/5/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1332

9/5/2017: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1332

DEFENDANT, HHS COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/6/2017: DEFENDANT, HHS COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Quest Diagnostics, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Everlene McCary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Everlene McCary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Notice (OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Everlene McCary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Everlene McCary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Everlene McCary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Everlene McCary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Everlene McCary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HHS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Quest Diagnostics Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOTTLER DOUGLAS E. ESQ.