This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2019 at 08:29:54 (UTC).

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS STATEWIDE PEST CONTROL

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATEWIDE PEST CONTROL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3790

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

STANLEY PEST CONTROL

CHARLES DUNN REAL ESTATE SERVICES

SOTO ARTURO

SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC.

STATEWIDE PEST CONTROL INC.

PACIFIC FINANCIAL EQUITIES LLC

DOES 1-30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SIEGEL MORENO & STETTLER APC

CAPALBO CHRISTOPHER JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

CRAWFORD SHELBY B. ESQ.

MCGARRY JAMES J.

BREMER KEITH GLENN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/30/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

9/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

8/30/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

9/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

8/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Settlement

5/21/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 05/21/2019

5/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 05/21/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

5/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Answer - Answer to Unverified Complaint

10/12/2018: Answer - Answer to Unverified Complaint

Answer

11/2/2018: Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Service of Summons

11/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Service of Summons

Objection - Objection Objection to Motion for Consolidtion

1/4/2019: Objection - Objection Objection to Motion for Consolidtion

Demand for Jury Trial

10/12/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

10/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

10/1/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT BY CHARLES DUNN REAL ESTATE SERVICES AND PACIFIC FINANCIAL EQUITES, LLC; ETC

9/17/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT BY CHARLES DUNN REAL ESTATE SERVICES AND PACIFIC FINANCIAL EQUITES, LLC; ETC

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

7/31/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

7/13/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((not entered)); Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 4:45 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 05/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Charles Dunn Real Estate Services (Defendant); Pacific Financial Equities, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT BY CHARLES DUNN REAL ESTATE SERVICES AND PACIFIC FINANCIAL EQUITES, LLC; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATEWIDE PEST CONTROL CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHARLES DUNN REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant