This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 02:19:39 (UTC).

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS EXPRESS HOSPITALITY INC., A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EXPRESS HOSPITALITY INC , A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0202

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

EXPRESS HOSPITALITY INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COURTYARD MARRIOTT ANAHEIM DBA PASEA HOTEL & SPA DBA ESTANCIA LA JOLLA HOTEL AND SPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSS BARBARA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/9/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/9/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/5/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/10/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

7/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Judgment

7/5/2022: Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/23/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/23/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summary of the Case

6/23/2022: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

6/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/23/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Everest National Insurance Company, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant