This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 23:02:15 (UTC).

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE CO. VS RESTORX DISASTER

Case Summary

On 08/07/2017 EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RESTORX DISASTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7291

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

RESTORX DISASTER SPECIALIST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULTON W. JEFFERY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

2/26/2018: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/26/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Minute Order

3/26/2018: Minute Order

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

3/26/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

Proof of Service

12/8/2017: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

12/8/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/7/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/7/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

8/7/2017: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

SUMMONS

8/7/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Notice; Filed by EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Summons; Filed by EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.