This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2023 at 08:34:42 (UTC).

EVELYN VELAZQUEZ VS THE ELEVANCE HEALTH COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 EVELYN VELAZQUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE ELEVANCE HEALTH COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7549

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELAZQUEZ EVELYN

Defendant

THE ELEVANCE HEALTH COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TSARUKYAN ANDRANIK

Defendant Attorney

GURNICK MATTHEW D

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN MANDATORY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

5/26/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN MANDATORY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER -CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

4/11/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER -CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/10/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/22/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

1/18/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/30/2022: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2025
  • Hearing08/25/2025 at 09:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2025
  • Hearing08/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Participate in Mandatory Settlement Program; Signed and Filed by: The Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., (Defendant); As to: Evelyn Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Participate in Mandatory Settlement Program: Filed By: The Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 08/25/2025 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Case Management Conference): Status Date changed from 04/26/2023 to 04/26/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Case Management Conference) to (Case Management Conference) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order -Confidential Designation Only; Signed and Filed by: The Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., (Defendant); As to: Evelyn Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Evelyn Velazquez (Plaintiff); As to: The Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/01/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Evelyn Velazquez (Plaintiff); As to: The Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Evelyn Velazquez (Plaintiff); As to: The Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Evelyn Velazquez (Plaintiff); As to: The Elevance Health Companies of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less