This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2018 at 19:27:03 (UTC).

EVELYN REY VS JUDITH C FIELDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 EVELYN REY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JUDITH C FIELDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0182

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

REY EVELYN

Defendants and Respondents

FIELDS JUDITH C.

FIELDS JUDY C.

DOES 1 TO 20

FIELDS J.C.

REY EVELYN B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHOW ROBIN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

9/12/2017: Minute Order

COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

9/12/2017: COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/1/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF EVELYN REY'S WAIVER OF COSTS, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND INTEREST PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT SECTION 3.1800

9/7/2017: PLAINTIFF EVELYN REY'S WAIVER OF COSTS, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND INTEREST PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT SECTION 3.1800

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/15/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/18/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. REFORMATION OF DEEDS ;ETC

5/5/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. REFORMATION OF DEEDS ;ETC

Unknown

7/20/2017: Unknown

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF EVELYN REY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING

9/7/2017: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF EVELYN REY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING

SUMMONS

5/5/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/15/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/15/2017: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/9/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/5/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT BY EVELYN B. REY AS TRUSTEE OF THE CAROLINA SPENDTHRIFT TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2015

9/7/2017: STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT BY EVELYN B. REY AS TRUSTEE OF THE CAROLINA SPENDTHRIFT TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2015

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT EVIDENCE CODE SECTIONS 452(D) & 453

9/7/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT EVIDENCE CODE SECTIONS 452(D) & 453

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 56; Default Prove Up Hearing (Hrng; Default Prove-up/Quiet Title; Finding in favor of Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • EXHIBIT LIST OF PLAINTIFF EVELYN REY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT BY EVELYN B. REY AS TRUSTEE OF THE CAROLINA SPENDTHRIFT TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT EVIDENCE CODE SECTIONS 452(D) & 453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Evelyn Rey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Evelyn Rey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Evelyn Rey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. REFORMATION OF DEEDS ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Evelyn Rey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less