This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 12:33:27 (UTC).

EVELYN NESBITT VS NISSAN OF TORRANCE, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 EVELYN NESBITT filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against NISSAN OF TORRANCE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4965

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NESBITT EVELYN

Defendant

NISSAN OF TORRANCE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISSNER WERNER

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/9/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/9/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/9/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Demand for Jury Trial

2/9/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

2/9/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2025
  • Hearing02/05/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • Hearing08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • Hearing07/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evelyn Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evelyn Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Evelyn Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelyn Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evelyn Nesbitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEISSNER WERNER R.