Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 18:43:18 (UTC).

EVELYN JANKOWSKI-DUBIN VS JOHN S. ROY HEATING & COOLING INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 EVELYN JANKOWSKI-DUBIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHN S ROY HEATING COOLING INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8424

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANKOWSKI-DUBIN EVELYN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JOHN S. ROY HEATING & COOLING INC. A CORPORATION

ROY JOHN S. AKA JOHN S. ROY HEATING & COOLING

YOMTOUBIAN CARMELA

JOHN S. ROY HEATING & COOLING INC.

HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIGGINS BARBARA A.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAKE DAVID NATHAN

ASH PAUL V

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

3/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

Answer

2/22/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/27/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULTS AND ALLOWING ANSWERS TO BE FILED

1/12/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULTS AND ALLOWING ANSWERS TO BE FILED

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/15/2021

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/15/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • Hearing04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Hearing04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant(s) John S. Roy and John S. Roy Heating and Cooling); Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carmela Yomtoubian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by John S. Roy Heating & Cooling Inc. (Defendant); John S. Roy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelyn Jankowski-Dubin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant