This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 18:16:03 (UTC).

EVELYN GARLAND-WEBB VS 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 EVELYN GARLAND-WEBB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0324

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARLAND-WEBB EVELYN

Defendant

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ YESENIA

Defendant Attorney

WAINFELD GABRIEL HORACE

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/4/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/4/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Hearing06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Evelyn Garland-Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelyn Garland-Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evelyn Garland-Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evelyn Garland-Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 CENTS ONLY STORES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ YESENIA