This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 16:57:00 (UTC).

EVELYN AGYIN VS THELMA BONUS

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 EVELYN AGYIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THELMA BONUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0555

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGYIN EVELYN

Defendants

BONUS THELMA

BONSU THELMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARTH JASON E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/18/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/05/2022

1/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/05/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

12/27/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

12/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/14/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

9/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/9/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

8/31/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57, Steven J. Kleifield, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CCP 583.150) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57, Steven J. Kleifield, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57, Steven J. Kleifield, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jason E. Barth (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (AMENDED); Filed by Evelyn Agyin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Evelyn Agyin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Pending Action); Filed by Evelyn Agyin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelyn Agyin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelyn Agyin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evelyn Agyin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evelyn Agyin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barth, Jason E.