This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 21:31:26 (UTC).

EVELYN AGUILAR VS ALEXANDER STRAUB, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 EVELYN AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDER STRAUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7184

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR EVELYN

Not Classified By Court and Claimant

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BIRD RIDES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

STRAUB ALEXANDER

FAIR FINANCIAL CORP. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

POPULUS GROUP LLC

POPULUS GROUP LLC DOE 11

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ IRA N

KATZ IRA NEIL ESQ.

Claimant Attorney

GAMS LANCE SCOTT DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEATON STACEY D.

HEPPS STEVEN M.

CORUM WILLIAM E.

CHOI DANIEL

SCOTT DENETTA EVELYN-JUANITA

GOLDBERG KAREN B.

GOLDBERG KAREN B. ESQ.

DEJARDIN BRADFORD JOHN

HEPPS STEVEN MARC ESQ.

CHO DANIEL S ESQ.

SCOTT DENETTA EVELYN-JUANITA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/30/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

5/4/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING WILLIAM A. CORUM TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR SAID APPLICATION

11/4/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING WILLIAM A. CORUM TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR SAID APPLICATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT POPULUS GROUP LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

11/5/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT POPULUS GROUP LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING WILLI...)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING WILLI...)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/6/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

10/9/2020: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/30/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING FAIR FINANCIAL CORP. LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING FAIR FINANCIAL CORP. LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

8/28/2020: Answer - ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/11/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT FAIR FINANCIAL CORP.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND STIPULATED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITI

6/24/2020: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT FAIR FINANCIAL CORP.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND STIPULATED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITI

Substitution of Attorney

2/27/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

3/5/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Lien

2/7/2020: Notice of Lien

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Conference (Re Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney William E. Corum, Counsel for Defendant Populus Group, LLC (Payment of $500.00 Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Bird Rides, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Populus Group, LLC (Doe 11) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (- For Order Allowing William E. Corum To Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Populus Group, LLC (Doe 11)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (, For An Order Allowing William E. Corum to Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Populus Group, LLC, or in the Alternative, for an Order Shortening Time to Hear Said Application) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alexander Straub (Defendant); Fair Financial Corp., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evelyn Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evelyn Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Evelyn Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelyn Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evelyn Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evelyn Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Populus Group, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIR FINANCIAL CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where BIRD RIDES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant