This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 01:19:33 (UTC).

EVELIN DESANTIAGO VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 EVELIN DESANTIAGO filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3208

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DESANTIAGO EVELIN

Respondents and Defendants

COMPTON CITY OF

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 50

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WRIGHT TIM D. ESQ.

WRIGHT TIMOTHY DANIEL

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY MOLLY S. DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

LEE DAVID D. DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL

CORNWELL CRAIG J. DEPUTY CITY ATTY

LEE DAVID DAIWAI

MURPHY MOLLY SUZANNE

CORNWELL CRAIG JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Opposition

10/16/2018: Opposition

Request for Dismissal

10/16/2018: Request for Dismissal

Brief

10/16/2018: Brief

Minute Order

10/25/2018: Minute Order

Other -

10/25/2018: Other -

Judgment

12/4/2018: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/4/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Order

12/4/2018: Order

REPLY TO RESPONDENT THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS; TIM D. WRIGHT, ESQ., DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EVIDENCE PRESENTED

9/21/2018: REPLY TO RESPONDENT THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS; TIM D. WRIGHT, ESQ., DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EVIDENCE PRESENTED

REPLY TO RESPONDENT CITY OF COMPTON OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONERS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

9/21/2018: REPLY TO RESPONDENT CITY OF COMPTON OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONERS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

REPLY TO RESPONDENT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (CHP)'S OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONER'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

9/21/2018: REPLY TO RESPONDENT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (CHP)'S OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONER'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

Minute Order

9/27/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE DEFENDANT STATE'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

9/27/2018: ORDER RE DEFENDANT STATE'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

TENTATIVE DECISION ON PETITION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A LATE CLAIM: DENIED

9/27/2018: TENTATIVE DECISION ON PETITION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A LATE CLAIM: DENIED

REPLY TO RESPONDENT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (CHP)S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS; TIM D. WRIGHT, ESQ., DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EVIDENCE PRESENTED

9/28/2018: REPLY TO RESPONDENT THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (CHP)S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS; TIM D. WRIGHT, ESQ., DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EVIDENCE PRESENTED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

9/25/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

9/11/2018: DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

DEFENDANT CHP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

9/11/2018: DEFENDANT CHP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PETITION TO BE EXCUSED FROM CLAIMS FILING REQUIREMENTS

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • Judgment (- Court Finding - After Court Trial - 12/04/2018 entered, plaintiff to take nothing by virtue of the complaint.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Order (Denying Relief to Petition from Provisions of Government Code Section 945.4); Filed by Evelin Desantiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Petition for Relief from Late Claim Law (Gov. Code 946.6) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Other - (Decision on petition for leave to file a late claim: denied); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Relief from Late Claim Law (Gov. Code...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Brief (for Relief From Government Code 945.4)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Opposition (supplemental brief opposing petition); Filed by The State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Evelin Desantiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Evelin Desantiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • PETITION FOR ORDER RELIEVING PETITIONER FROM PROVISIONS OF GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 945.4; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Evelin Desantiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPTON CITY OF is a litigant