This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 06:21:31 (UTC).

EVELIA SAAVEDRA VS BERVELIN ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 EVELIA SAAVEDRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BERVELIN ESTRADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6429

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAAVEDRA EVELIA

Defendant

ESTRADA BERVELIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESAROS CHRISTOPHER PAUL

Defendant Attorney

VO MICHELLE NGOC

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/17/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2024
  • Hearing07/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bervelin Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Bervelin Estrada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Evelia Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evelia Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelia Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evelia Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESAROS CHRISTOPHER PAUL