Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 12:27:46 (UTC).

EVELIA PULVER VS GARY FUKUMOTO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 EVELIA PULVER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARY FUKUMOTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3994

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULVER EVELIA

Defendants

FUKUMOTO GARY

YEBISU SHELLY LEIKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PENNELL JONATHAN M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES {\PAR} {\PAR}

12/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES {\PAR} {\PAR}

PI General Order

12/17/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Evelia Pulver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates {\par} {\par}); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evelia Pulver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evelia Pulver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evelia Pulver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PENNELL JONATHAN M.