This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 21:42:12 (UTC).

EVE S. RAMIREZ VS WYATT ANDREW HEFTI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 EVE S RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WYATT ANDREW HEFTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3941

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ EVE S.

Defendants

HEFTI WYATT ANDREW

RUSSELL JANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOMINGUEZ TIMOTHY L.

ALABISE PATRICIA DENISE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/29/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

5/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2024
  • Hearing04/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eve S. Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eve S. Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by Eve S. Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eve S. Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eve S. Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eve S. Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINGUEZ TIMOTHY L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALABISE PATRICIA DENISE