This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2019 at 20:21:41 (UTC).

EVAN GERTZ VS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 EVAN GERTZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7197

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GERTZ EVAN

Respondents and Defendants

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKLEY STUART

GREENFIELD BRETT A. ESQ.

GREENFIELD BRETT A.ESQ.

GREENFIELD BRETT ALAN ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

TAYLOR DANIEL JOSEPH

TAYLOR DANIEL JOSEPH ESQ.

PRZYBYLOWSKI CHRISTIAN XAVIER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

6/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Settlement

6/18/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

6/18/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

2/20/2019: Stipulation and Order

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

11/9/2018: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Substitution of Attorney

2/8/2018: Substitution of Attorney

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/30/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/30/2017: SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/9/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Evan Gertz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (- Final Status Conference; - Court Order Pursuant to Notice o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Evan Gertz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Evan Gertz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evan Gertz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRZYBYLOWSKI CHRISTIAN XAVIER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR DANIEL JOSEPH