This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2020 at 18:17:33 (UTC).

EVAN FONG VS KINGS ROAD 2014, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 EVAN FONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KINGS ROAD 2014, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8683

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FONG EVAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KINGS ROAD 2014 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FEI ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KINGS ROAD 2014 LLC

FEI ENTERPRISES INC.

JB CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC.

Cross Defendant

ELITE WATERPROOFING & COATINGS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY PAUL M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

AU PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Settlement

9/23/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/28/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/17/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of the Case

8/17/2020: Statement of the Case

Notice of Ruling

8/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

Case Management Statement

3/5/2020: Case Management Statement

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/16/2020: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

1/17/2020: Cross-Complaint

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSSCOMPLAINT

1/8/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSSCOMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FEI Enterprises, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED); Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketOrder (ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON (1) KINGS ROAD 2014, LLC and (2) FEI ENTERPRISES, INC BY DELIVERY TO SECRETARY OF STATE); Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (FOR ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON ENTITY DEFENDANTS BY DELIVERY TO SECRETARY OF STATE; DECLARATIONS OF PAUL M. KELLEY, AND MIGUEL ANGEL MOLINA IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evan Fong (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELITE WATERPROOFING AND COATINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FEI ENTERPRISES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AU PATRICK