This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2021 at 07:32:42 (UTC).

EVAGELINE WOOD VS CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 EVAGELINE WOOD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4675

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOOD EVAGELINE

Defendant

CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FARZAM JOSEPH S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • Hearing06/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Evageline Wood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Evageline Wood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Evageline Wood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA INSURANCE GUARANTEE ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARZAM, JOSEPH S