This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 01:02:24 (UTC).

EVA GAYTAN VS KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 EVA GAYTAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6952

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAYTAN EVA

Defendants

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING LLC

KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY CARE DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY

SUAREZ NAOMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE TAYLOR HOLLIS

Defendant Attorney

VIGIL HEATHER M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/25/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/21/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Mail

4/25/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

4/25/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

5/25/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

5/27/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Eva Gaytan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kindred Healthcare Operating, LLC (Defendant); Southern California Specialty Care (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Eva Gaytan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Eva Gaytan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Eva Gaytan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eva Gaytan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eva Gaytan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eva Gaytan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL SAN GABRIEL VALLEY is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIGIL HEATHER M.