This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 08:24:16 (UTC).

EVA CARDENAS VS ROBERTO LUNA ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 EVA CARDENAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROBERTO LUNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4865

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CARDENAS EVA

Defendants and Respondents

LUNA ROBERTO

DOES 1 TO 100

HONOLUNA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DEENIHAN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS CROSS COMPLAINANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE ISSUE OF DUTY

9/5/2018: ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS CROSS COMPLAINANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE ISSUE OF DUTY

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/31/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Unknown

7/25/2018: Unknown

Answer

10/12/2017: Answer

Other -

10/12/2017: Other -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/25/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/25/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

9/5/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

SUMMONS

9/5/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by ROBERTO LUNA (Defendant); HONOLUNA INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • ORDER RE:DEFENDANTS CROSS COMPLAINANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THE ISSUE OF DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by ROBERTO LUNA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by ROBERTO LUNA (Defendant); HONOLUNA INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Answer; Filed by ROBERTO LUNA (Defendant); HONOLUNA INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by EVA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by EVA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by EVA CARDENAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC674865    Hearing Date: January 10, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

On September 5, 2017, Plaintiff Eva Cardenas filed this action against defendants Roberta Luna (erroneously sued as “Roberto Luna”) (“Luna”) and Honoluna, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”) for premises liability arising out of a January 12, 2017 slip and fall. On July 24, 2019, Luna served Supplemental Demand for Production (Set One) and Supplemental Interrogatories (Set One) on Plaintiff. On October 14, 2019, defense counsel sent a meet and confer letter requesting verified answers. Defense counsel also sent emails and called. Plaintiff did not respond. Luna seeks to compel Plaintiff’s responses and monetary sanctions.

A party may propound a supplemental interrogatory or supplemental demand for production of documents to elicit any later acquired information bearing on all answers previously made by any party. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.070, subd. (a), 2031.050, subd. (a).) Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).)

Plaintiff filed no opposition to these Motions and did not serve responses to Luna’s requests for discovery. Accordingly, the motions to compel Plaintiff’s responses are GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objection, to Luna’s Supplemental Interrogatories (Set One) and Supplemental Demand for Production (Set One) within seven (7) days of the date of this Order.

Where the court grants a motion to compel responses, sanctions shall be imposed against the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel, unless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).) Luna’s request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Plaintiff and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the amount of $470.00 for two hours at defense counsel’s hourly rate of $175.00 and $120.00 in filing fees, to be paid within twenty days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.