This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2020 at 11:18:14 (UTC).

EUROPEAN EXPO LIMITED INC VS IRIS E MIRANDA ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 EUROPEAN EXPO LIMITED INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IRIS E MIRANDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1832

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

EUROPEAN EXPO LIMITED INC.

CREDENTIAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

SIERRA CREDIT CORPORATION

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERIVICES

LANDEROS OSCAR

SADDLEBACK ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION

CORONADO JORGE

CALIFORNIA DEPARTRMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

PREMIER AUTO CREDIT INC.

PREMIER AUTO CREDIT

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

FIRESIDE AUTO SALES

DOES 1-50

MIRANDA IRIS E.

HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP.

MIRANDA IRIS E. DBA FIRESIDE AUTO SALES

FASEN LEO

Defendant, Respondent and Not Classified By Court

FIRESIDE AUTO SALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FASEN LEO ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN L. FALLAT

FALLAT JOHN LYSTER ESQ.

ELDER WILLIAM NORMAN

FALLAT JOHN L. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FALLAT JOHN LYSTER ESQ.

ELDER WILLIAM NORMAN

FALLAT JOHN L. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

GREEN RONALD JOHN

VANLOCHEM MICHAEL DONALD

UZUNYAN CHRISTOPHER RICCARDO

YADEGARI ANNA

NAGBY RICHARD

VUKOVIC ADAM A.

VUKOVIC ADAM A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS ON DEPOSIT WITH COURT

1/31/2020: Order - ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS ON DEPOSIT WITH COURT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/04/2020, COPY OF SIGNED ORDER

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/04/2020, COPY OF SIGNED ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 12/17/2019

Notice of Settlement

12/17/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Request for Dismissal

10/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING, NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

11/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING, NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

10/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)]

10/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)]

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/8/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

5/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

5/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Substitution of Attorney

6/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE COURT TRIAL

6/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE COURT TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 02/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/04/2020, Copy of Signed Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketOrder (for Distribution of Proceeds on Deposit with Court); Filed by Sierra Credit Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by European Expo Limited, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by European Expo Limited, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by European Expo Limited, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EUROPEAN EXPO LIMITED INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CREDENTIAL ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSE OF FINANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES is a litigant