Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 11:10:53 (UTC).

EUNHEE MASSER VS DAVID SHIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 EUNHEE MASSER filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DAVID SHIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2222

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASSER EUNHEE

Defendants

COLDWELL BANKER GEORGE REALTY

SHIN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

Other Attorneys

KIM JAMIE JIYOON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR

Case Management Statement

3/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

5/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

2/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN SMITH

1/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN SMITH

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

1/25/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Answer

1/25/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN SMITH PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 435.5

1/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRIAN SMITH PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 435.5

Request for Dismissal

1/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/3/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by High Ten Partners, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Coldwell Banker George Realty (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by David Shin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR); Filed by High Ten Partners, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Coldwell Banker George Realty (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by High Ten Partners, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Coldwell Banker George Realty (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Eunhee Masser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF BRIAN SMITH PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 435.5); Filed by David Shin (Defendant); High Ten Partners, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Coldwell Banker George Realty (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Shin (Defendant); High Ten Partners, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Coldwell Banker George Realty (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Brian Smith); Filed by David Shin (Defendant); High Ten Partners, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Coldwell Banker George Realty (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eunhee Masser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eunhee Masser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eunhee Masser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eunhee Masser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eunhee Masser (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER GEORGE REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAMIE JIYOON ESQ.