This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 16:57:00 (UTC).

EUN SEONG KIM, ET AL. VS A-JU TOURS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 EUN SEONG KIM filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against A-JU TOURS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2469

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIM EUN SEONG AN INDIVIDUAL

CHO BYUNG WOOK AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

MUTUAL TRANS INC. A CALIFORNIA

A-JU TOURS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BAHK HELEN YOUNG

BAHK DANIEL PYOUNG AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE.

BAHK HENRY H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK PETER

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/25/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • Hearing05/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Hearing05/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eun Seong Kim, an individual (Plaintiff); Byung Wook Cho, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eun Seong Kim, an individual (Plaintiff); Byung Wook Cho, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eun Seong Kim, an individual (Plaintiff); Byung Wook Cho, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUTUAL TRANS INC. is a litigant