This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 16:14:55 (UTC).

EUN CHU LEE VS STEVEN BARKIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 EUN CHU LEE filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against STEVEN BARKIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3189

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE EUN CHU

Defendants

BARKIN STEVEN

CHOI TOM

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN BARKIN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN BARKIN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOLETSKY ROY

KOLETSKY ROY A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/26/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eun Chu Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eun Chu Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eun Chu Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eun Chu Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eun Chu Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eun Chu Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOLETSKY ROY AARON