This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 01:30:33 (UTC).

EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, ASSIGNEE OF VEGA TEXTILE INC. VS DAMO TEXTILE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, ASSIGNEE OF VEGA TEXTILE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAMO TEXTILE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0536

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY ASSIGNEE OF VEGA TEXTILE INC.

Defendant

DAMO TEXTILE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA DAMO CLOTHING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRODKIN ALAN L.

BRODKIN ALAN L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/2/2020: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/12/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, assignee of VEGA TEXTILE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, assignee of VEGA TEXTILE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, assignee of VEGA TEXTILE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, assignee of VEGA TEXTILE INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAMO TEXTILES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY DBA WEAVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN