Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2021 at 18:14:42 (UTC).

EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, ASSIGNEE OF A-PLUS FABRIC, INC. VS J & G INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, ASSIGNEE OF A-PLUS FABRIC, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against J G INTERNATIONAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7878

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

J & G INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN

Defendant Attorney

PAK J.P. PIL

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/12/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Euler Hermes North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Euler Hermes North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by J & G International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Euler Hermes North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Euler Hermes North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Euler Hermes North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EULER HERMES NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY DBA WEAVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN